California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013