Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2014 | Read first time. To print. |