|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6399.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 4716.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5224.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5092.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|