Assembly | 06/05/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2014 | Read first time. To print. |