|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6035.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1755.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5094.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|