Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 5229.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|