|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 6099.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 4456.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 4758.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|