Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2014 | Read first time. To print. |