|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5840.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4599.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|