LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1792
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1792
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1792
Compare Versions
AB1792 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB1792 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1792 Amended August 27, 2014
AB1792 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1792 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1792 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1792 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1792 Amended April 1, 2014
AB1792 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1792 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB1792 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1792 Amended August 27, 2014
AB1792 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1792 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1792 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1792 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1792 Amended April 1, 2014
AB1792 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare