|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6624.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4618.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5202.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|