|
07/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 7. Page 5801.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4192.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 4954.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|