Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2014 | Read first time. To print. |