|
09/17/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6099.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4466.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 5327.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5218.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4939.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|