Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2014 | Read first time. To print. |