Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5347.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|