|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 459, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 6108.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 4494.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 4472.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|