California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2013

Amended

Bill August 29, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill July 11, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill May 21, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013
Bill March 12, 2013