California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1820 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/21/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1820AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mullin FEBRUARY 18, 2014 An act to  amend   amend, repeal, and add  Section 18934 of the Government Code, relating to state employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1820, as amended, Mullin. State employment: applications. Existing law requires every applicant for examination for state employment to file an application with the Department of Human Resources or an appointing power designated by the department. This bill would  , commencing on July 1, 2016,  require the department or the designated appointing power, whenever it receives an application for examination that was filed online, to provide the  e-mail   electronic communication  address of the department or the designated appointing power to the applicant, to contact the applicant using  e-mail   electronic communication  instead of postal mail, unless the applicant specifically requests otherwise, and to inform the applicant that he or she be provided with employment inquiry notifications and his or score and rank on the examination using  e-mail,   electronic communication  unless the applicant specifically requests to be notified using postal mail.  The bill would also make related nonsubstantive changes.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 18934 of the   Government Code   is amended to read:  18934.  (a)     (1)    Every applicant for examination shall file an application with the department or a designated appointing power as directed in the examination announcement. Applications shall be accepted free of any charge to the applicant.  Such applications when filed   Filed applications  and all other examination materials, including examination questions and any written material, are the property of the department and are confidential records not open to inspection except as provided by law.  The   (2)     The  application shall include a place for listing volunteer experience and  such   that  experience shall be considered if it is relevant to the position being applied for and shall state that relevant volunteer experience will be given consideration as qualifying experience for state employment.  (b) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2016, and is repealed on January 1, 2017.   SEC. 2.   Section 18934 is added to the   Government Code   , to read:   18934. (a) (1) Every applicant for examination shall file an application with the department or a designated appointing power as directed in the examination announcement. Applications shall be accepted free of any charge to the applicant. Filed applications and all other examination materials, including examination questions and any written material, are the property of the department and are confidential records not open to inspection except as provided by law. (2) The application shall include a place for listing volunteer experience and that experience shall be considered if it is relevant to the position being applied for and shall state that relevant volunteer experience will be given consideration as qualifying experience for state employment. (b) Whenever the department or a designated appointing power receives an application for examination that was filed online, the department, or the designated appointing power, shall do all of the following: (1) Provide the electronic communication address of the department or the electronic communication address of the designated appointing power to the applicant. (2) Contact the applicant using electronic communication instead of postal mail, unless the applicant specifically requests otherwise. (3) Inform the applicant that he or she will be provided with employment inquiry notifications and his or her score and rank on the examination using electronic communication, unless the applicant specifically requests to be notified using postal mail. (c) This section shall become operative on July 1, 2016.   SECTION 1.   Section 18934 of the Government Code is amended to read: 18934. (a) (1) Every applicant for examination shall file an application with the department or a designated appointing power as directed in the examination announcement. Applications shall be accepted free of any charge to the applicant. Applications, when filed and all other examination materials, including examination questions and any written material, are the property of the department and are confidential records not open to inspection except as provided by law. (2) The application shall include a place for listing volunteer experience and that experience shall be considered if it is relevant to the position being applied for and shall state that relevant volunteer experience will be given consideration as qualifying experience for state employment. (b) Whenever the department or a designated appointing power receives an application for examination that was filed online, the department, or the designated appointing power, shall do all of the following: (1) Provide the e-mail address of the department or the e-mail address of the designated appointing power to the applicant. (2) Contact the applicant using e-mail instead of postal mail, unless the applicant specifically requests otherwise. (3) Inform the applicant that he or she will be provided with employment inquiry notifications and his or her score and rank on the examination using e-mail, unless the applicant specifically requests to be notified using postal mail.