California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1820 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014