California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill June 17, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014