Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 5293.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|