California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1837 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014