07/09/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2014. | |||
07/09/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/02/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.). | ||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2014 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5099.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Read first time. To print. |