California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 23, 2014