Senate | 08/14/2014 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5175.) | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Read first time. To print. |