Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Read first time. To print. |