California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1892 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014