Senate | 06/23/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 5174.) | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Read first time. To print. |