California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1912 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/19/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1912INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Holden FEBRUARY 19, 2014 An act to add Section 33543 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1912, as introduced, Holden. Pupil instruction: history-social science framework: election of President Barack Obama. Existing law requires the Instructional Quality Commission to recommend curriculum frameworks to the State Board of Education. Existing law defines "curriculum framework" as an outline of the components of a given course of study designed to provide state direction to school districts in the provision of instructional programs. This bill would require the commission and the state board to consider including, in the history-social science curriculum framework adopted in the course of the next submission cycle following January 1, 2015, instruction on the election of President Barack Obama and the significance of the United States electing its first African American President, as appropriate. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) The election of Barack Hussein Obama to the office of President of the United States was a historic step in the effort towards equality in the United States. (b) Before the Civil Rights Movement, intimidation and physical violence prevented millions of African Americans from voting and alienated them from the electoral process. (c) The Voting Rights Act of 1965 was a civil rights victory that inspired more ethnic minorities to register to vote and pursue elected office. (d) Barack Obama attended Harvard Law School where he became the first African American president of the Harvard Law Review. (e) After law school, Barack Obama worked to fulfill the spirit of the Voting Rights Act of 1965 by encouraging people to register to vote. (f) Barack Obama was first elected to the Illinois State Senate in 1996 and to the United States Senate in 2004. (g) Senator Barack Obama was elected the 44th President of the United States and first African American President on November 4, 2008, and was sworn in on January 20, 2009. (h) In honor of this milestone in civil rights, President Obama was awarded the Nobel Peace Prize. (i) President Obama was reelected on November 6, 2012, and was sworn in for his second term on January 20, 2013. SEC. 2. Section 33543 is added to the Education Code, to read: 33543. The commission and the state board shall consider including, in the history-social science curriculum framework adopted in the course of the next submission cycle following January 1, 2015, instruction on the election of President Barack Obama and the significance of the United States electing its first African American President, as appropriate.