California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1912 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill March 18, 2014