Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5257.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|