Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2013 | Read first time. To print. |