California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1920 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014