California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1929 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014