California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Amended

Bill June 30, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014