|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4457.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 5176.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|