|
08/19/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1692.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 9. Page 1604.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|