Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 2.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Read first time. To print. |