|
07/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4193.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 4587.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|