Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2014 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Read first time. To print. |