|
07/23/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4848.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|