07/21/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 162, Statutes of 2014. | |||
07/21/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/09/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4194.). | ||
Senate | 06/25/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 4963.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Read first time. To print. |