California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1990 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 15, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014