LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1995
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1995
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1995
Compare Versions
AB1995 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB1995 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB1995 Amended June 30, 2014
AB1995 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1995 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1995 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB1995 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB1995 Amended June 30, 2014
AB1995 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1995 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare