California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB20 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2013

Amended

Bill June 11, 2013
Bill May 29, 2013
Bill February 25, 2013