Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2014 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2013 | Read first time. To print. |