California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2000 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014