California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 13, 2014
Bill August 6, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014