California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2005 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/14/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2005AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 14, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Chesbro and Levine FEBRUARY 20, 2014 An act to amend Sections 19421 and 19425 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2005, as amended, Chesbro. California Horse Racing Board: membership and per diem. Existing law, the Horse Racing Law, provides for the operation of live horse racing in this state and for wagering on horse races, and for the operation of satellite wagering facilities, subject to regulation and oversight by the California Horse Racing Board, as specified.  That law   The Horse Racing Law  provides that the board  consist   consists  of 7 members appointed by the Governor and that the members of the board receive a per diem of $100 for each day spent in attendance at official meetings and be reimbursed for traveling and other expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of official duties. This bill would expand the membership of the board to  11   9  members, 7 public members appointed by the Governor,  2 Members   one Member  of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, and  2 Members   , one Member  of the Assembly appointed by the Speaker of the  Assembly, as specified   Assembly  . The bill would provide that Members of the Legislature appointed to the board shall serve as nonvoting, ex officio members of the board and for a term of 2 years, with no limit on the number of terms that may be served by any one Member. The bill would  make the   provide that  legislative members  ineligible   are subject to certain requirements, including, among other things, ineligibility  to serve on the subcommittees of the board  and   . The bill  would  also  prohibit a legislative member of the board from receiving per diem or reimbursement for traveling and other expenses from the board for his or her service on the board. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19421 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 19421. (a) The board consists of  11   nine  members, seven public members appointed by the Governor,  two Members   one Member  of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules  of which one Member shall be from a district that is in the northern zone and one Member   from a district that is in the southern zone, and two Members   ,   and one Member  of the Assembly appointed by the Speaker of the  Assembly of which one Member shall be from a district that is in the northern zone and one Member from a district that is in the central zone   Assembly  . Each public member shall hold office for a term of four years, commencing at the expiration of the previous term. A public member shall be eligible for reappointment at the discretion of the Governor. Any vacancy of a public member shall be filled by the Governor for the unexpired term. (b)  (1)    Members of the Legislature appointed to the board shall serve as nonvoting, ex officio members of the board and each appointed Member shall serve a term of two years, with no limit on the number of terms that may be served by any one Member.  Members   (   2)     Members  of the Legislature serving on the board  shall be ineligible to serve on subcommittees of the board.   are subject to all of the following:   (A) A legislative member is ineligible to serve on subcommittees of the board.   (B) A legislative member has no authority to designate a member of his or her legislative staff or anyone else to serve as his or her designee on the board.   (C) A legislative member who fails to attend three consecutive meetings of the board shall be replaced by the appointing authority.  SEC. 2. Section 19425 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 19425. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the members of the board shall receive a per diem of one hundred dollars ($100) for each day spent in attendance at meetings scheduled by the chairperson of the board for the purpose of fulfilling the duties of the board pursuant to this chapter, and shall be reimbursed for traveling and other expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of official duties. (b) A Member of the Legislature serving on the board shall not receive per diem or reimbursement for traveling or other expenses from the board for his or her service on the board pursuant to subdivision (a).